U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40015
  • Case Name: Nashef LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order to Update]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.