U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30014
  • Case Name: William Hutchinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Signature Page]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.