U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10035
  • Case Name: Thomas G. Norton and Denise A. Morley-Norton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Conference]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Signature Page]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Signature Page]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.