U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10050
  • Case Name: Eric Stuart Dickman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order to Update]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.