U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10108
  • Case Name: James A. Lapery
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order Approving Final Report & Account]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Response]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Sale]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.