U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11110
  • Case Name: WJH Elm Street Somerville, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order (Generic)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Employ]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.