U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10272
  • Case Name: Outkast Electrical Contractors, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Objection]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Vote]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [For Order/Authority]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Affidavit]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Vote]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order To Set Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Extend Time]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Amended Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Supplemental Document]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.