U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11588
  • Case Name: Karen R Merritt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Dismiss Case]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Initial Transmittal to (BAP)/District Court]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice to District Court]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Supplemental Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Miscellaneous Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion To Reconsider]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.