U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40817
  • Case Name: Heywood Healthcare, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • September 29, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • September 29, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Claims Agent Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Assume/Reject]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amended Plan]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.