U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11228
  • Case Name: Gabrielle Rene
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Waiver]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [File Late]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Document]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Exhibit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.