U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10058
  • Case Name: U.S. Credit, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Response]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Report & Hearing Agenda]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Supplemental Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Supplemental Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Generic Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Objection to Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Compensation]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Compensation]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • January 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Extend Time]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Amended Disclosure Statement]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Objection to Professional Fees]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion To Sell]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Miscellaneous Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion for Approval]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.