U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-01074
  • Case Name: Desmond v. National Financial Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • October 02, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • September 26, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion for Approval]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.