U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11246
  • Case Name: Car Connections Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Compensation]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice of Substantial Consummation]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Compensation]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Compromise]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Affidavit]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Vote]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [For Order/Authority]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Amended Plan]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Gray, Stephen S. [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.