U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40370
  • Case Name: Richard C. Engrassia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Opposition]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Assignment of Claims]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Claim]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amend]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Compensation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.