U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40351
  • Case Name: Marian E Stolk
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 22, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Contempt]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.