U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-12128
  • Case Name: Roger A. Parent and Kellie A. Parent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order Approving Final Report & Account]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [UST Compensation]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Report & Hearing Agenda]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Objection to Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Opposition]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Response]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.