U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11004
  • Case Name: 29 Gorham Street LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [For Order/Authority]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice of Atty Suspension (Supv Only)]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Employ]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Opposition]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.