U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11233
  • Case Name: Milk Street Cafe, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Supplemental Document]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Compensation]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Substantial Consummation]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Response]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order (Generic)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.