U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11196
  • Case Name: Horizon Interiors, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application for Compensation]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Supplemental Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Objection to Professional Fees]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Compensation]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Compensation]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Compromise]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion To Set/Combine Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Status Report]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Darr, Stephen [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.