U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30484
  • Case Name: Nancy C Kahn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Convert Case to 13]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Schedules (Original)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.