U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40709
  • Case Name: Westborough SPE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Reply]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Opposition]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Amended Order]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion for Interim/Supplemental Distribution]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Supplemental Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Response]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion for Interim/Supplemental Distribution]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compel]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Clarify]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Interim/Supplemental Distribution]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Reconsider]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compel]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Reconsider]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Set/Combine Hearing/Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Opposition]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion For Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Affidavit]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion Determine]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Set/Combine Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection to Claim]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compel]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Affidavit]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Opposition]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Set/Combine Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Set/Combine Hearing/Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Set/Combine Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Set/Combine Hearing/Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion To Set/Combine Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Set/Combine Hearing/Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Clarify]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion for Emergency/Expedited Determination]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Remove Party]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Objection]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Remove or Remove Party]
  • March 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion For Sanctions/Costs]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion for Lis Pendens]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Lis Pendens]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Response]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion For Sanctions/Costs]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Supplemental Document]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Compel]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Response]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Affidavit]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Sanctions/Costs]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [For Order/Authority]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Clarify]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.