U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11863
  • Case Name: Douglas Gregory Bezio
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules (Original)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedules (Original)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Join]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.