U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10887
  • Case Name: Snowshoe Millworks LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Pay]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [** Not Used ** Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order on Motion to Disburse]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Response]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Objection]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Supplemental Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order (Generic)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Objection]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Status Report Re: Sale of Estate Property]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Dismiss Case]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiss, Steven [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.