U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11265
  • Case Name: Charles Manuel and Sharon Manuel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Opposition]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Update]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Convert Case to 7]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.