U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30170
  • Case Name: Mexcalito Taco-Bar, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion To Sell]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Application for Compensation]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Sale]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James S [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.