U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40913
  • Case Name: Deidra L Kilgore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Intent]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Schedules (Original)]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.