U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11628
  • Case Name: Mark David Goodman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (Dismissed/Converted)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee and Closing Case]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Vacate]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.