U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40933
  • Case Name: Joseph W Post
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion To Sell]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Assignment of Claims]
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.