U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11973
  • Case Name: Scott J. Richardson and Doris M. Richardson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change(Ch. 13 Only)]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.