U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-01084
  • Case Name: Gridley v. Millenium Trust Company, LLC as custodian FBO Prim
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
  • September 30, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.