U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-11277
  • Case Name: Elena C Sepulveda
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance/Representation]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion for Approval]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.