U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41002
  • Case Name: Kermit J. Morris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion To Sell]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Response]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Sale]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Employ]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.