U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10178-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.