U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10301-3
  • Case Name: USA v. ERNESTO ANDUJAR ECHAVARRIA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.