U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10038-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Erison Jose Cuello-Nunez, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Services/Probation - Request/Memo/Summons/Warrant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • October 11, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.