U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-md-03083
  • Case Name: IN RE: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amend]
  • April 22, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 11, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Settlement]
  • April 11, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 10, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 02, 2025: [Declaration]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 10, 2024: [Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 07, 2024: [Affidavit]
  • October 07, 2024: [Sur-reply to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.