U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10216-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson, et. al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcripts at government expense]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appendix/Exhibit]
November, 2024
  • November 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Opposition to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Response to Court Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.