U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-10350-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Tam et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Copy Mailed]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.