U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10309-3
  • Case Name: USA v. JDM Supply, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum - not related to a motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.