U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10127-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Davila et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [USMS Process Receipt and Return]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 08, 2024: [Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.