U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10299-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 04, 2024: [Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.