U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bied
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 03, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.