U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10325-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Nancy Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Letter- non-motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2025: [USMS Process Receipt and Return]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismissal by Government]
  • April 03, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 16, 2025: [Letter- non-motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2025: [Travel]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 08, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2024: [Letter- non-motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.