U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10199-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Phim et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 05, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.