U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41012
  • Case Name: Stacy Lynn Falco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order to Update]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.