U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-30543
  • Case Name: Ricardo Molina and Jacqueline Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Amend]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order to Update]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.