U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10275-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashe et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.