U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10217-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appendix/Exhibit]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.