U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-04007
  • Case Name: Law Offices of Hector E. Pineiro, P.C. et al v. Torres-Requena
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Suspend]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Suspend]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Miscellaneous Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.