U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-01075
  • Case Name: NESV Ice, LLC v. GSPP NESV LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Telephonic Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.